Wu, Sing Man (CPSO#: 29261)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Jun 1977

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 27 Sep 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 203
1448 Lawrence Avenue East
North York ON  M4A 2V6
Phone: (416) 449-7121
Fax: (416) 449-7122
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. S.M. Wu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 03 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Wu ( CPSO# 29261 )

Business Address:
203 - 1448 Lawrence Avenue East
North York ON  M4V 2V6
Phone Number: (416) 449-7121

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1977
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Sep 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 27 Sep 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 27 Sep 2017 Active View Details [+]
            As from September 27, 2017, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Sing Man Wu, in
            accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Wu to the College of
            Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:


                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
                                          ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                of
                  
                                    DR. SING MAN WU
                                          ("Dr. Wu")
                  
                                                to 
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                  
                  
                  
            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "Discipline Committee" means the Discipline Committee of the College;
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan; 

                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public;
                  
                  "QAC" means the Quality Assurance Committee of the College.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Wu, certificate of registration number 29261, am a member of the
                  College.  

            (3)   I, Dr. Wu, acknowledge that concerns have been identified with respect to
                  my standard of practice and my knowledge, skill and judgment.  I am aware
                  of the College's concern about protecting the public. 

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (4)   I, Dr. Wu, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking,
                  effective immediately ("Effective Date").

            (5)   Resignation

                  (a)   I, Dr. Wu, will resign from the College effective December 31, 2017
                        (the "Resignation Date").
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Wu, hereby undertake not to apply or re-apply for
                        registration as a physician to practise medicine in Ontario or any
                        other jurisdiction after the Resignation Date.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Wu, acknowledge and provide consent that in the event that
                        the College should become aware that I am in breach of this
                        Undertaking including, but not limited to, becoming aware that I
                        have either applied, re-applied or attempted to apply or re-apply
                        for registration as a physician or for a certificate of
                        registration, or equivalent, to practise medicine in any
                        jurisdiction after the Resignation Date, the College shall, in its
                        sole discretion, have the right to proceed with a disciplinary
                        proceeding on the basis of a breach of this Undertaking and shall
                        have the right to proceed with the QAC process it terminated as a
                        result of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Wu, undertake to the College to abide by the College's
                        Policy on Practice Management Considerations for Physicians Who
                        Cease to Practise, Take an Extended Leave of Absence or Close Their
                        Practice Due to Relocation, a copy of which is attached hereto as
                        Appendix "A". 
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Wu, undertake to the College that upon signing this
                        Undertaking, I shall forward a request to the General Manager of
                        the OHIP that my billing number be deactivated for services
                        rendered after the Resignation Date.  I acknowledge that I have
                        executed the OHIP consent form, attached hereto as Appendix "B" and
                        that the consent forms part of this Undertaking. 
                  
            (6)   Clinical Supervision

                  (a)   I, Dr. Wu, undertake to practise under the guidance of a clinical
                        supervisor(s) acceptable to the College (the "Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)"), from the Effective Date and for the period up to
                        and including the Resignation Date ("Clinical Supervision"). 
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Wu, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Clinical
                        Supervisor's undertaking attached hereto as Appendix "C", and
                        understand what is required of the Clinical Supervisor(s). The
                        Clinical Supervisor(s) will, at minimum:
                  
                        (i)   Meet with me at my Practice Location, or another location
                              approved by the College, bi-weekly;
                  
                        (ii)  Review at least fifteen (15) of my patient charts at every
                              meeting;
                  
                        (iii) Discuss any concerns arising from the chart reviews;
                  
                        (iv)  Perform any other duties, such as reviewing other documents
                              or conducting interviews with staff or colleagues, that the
                              Clinical Supervisor(s) deem necessary to my Clinical
                              Supervision; and
                  
                        (v)   Submit a written report to the College at the completion of
                              the Clinical Supervision, or earlier if the Clinical
                              Supervisor(s) has concerns about my standard of practice.
                  
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Wu, acknowledge that the charts reviewed shall be selected
                        by the Clinical Supervisor(s) based on the areas of concern
                        identified in the report(s) of the Assessor or concerns that may
                        arise during the period of Clinical Supervision.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Wu, undertake to cooperate fully with the Clinical
                        Supervision of my practice described in section (6) of this
                        Undertaking and Appendix "C" attached. 
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Wu, undertake to ensure that Appendix "C" to this
                        Undertaking is signed and delivered to the College within fifteen
                        (15) days of the date I execute this Undertaking.
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Wu, undertake that if a person who has given an undertaking
                        in Appendix "C" to this Undertaking is unable or unwilling to
                        continue to fulfill its provisions, I shall, within fifteen (15)
                        days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed undertaking in
                        the same form from a similarly qualified person who is acceptable
                        to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the College
                        within that time.
                  
                  (g)   I, Dr. Wu, undertake that if I am unable to obtain a Clinical
                        Supervisor as set out in sections (6)(e) and (f) above, including
                        returning a signed Appendix "C" within fifteen (15) days, I will
                        cease practising medicine until such time as I have obtained a
                        Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.  
                  
                  (h)   I, Dr. Wu, acknowledge that if I am required to cease practise as a
                        result of section (6)(g) above this will constitute a term,
                        condition or limitation on my certificate of registration and said
                        term, condition or limitation will be included on the public
                        register.
                  
            (7)   Monitoring

                  (a)   I, Dr. Wu, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location that I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                        limited to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any
                        jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location(s)"), within five
                        (5) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I further
                        undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice
                        Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at that
                        location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Wu, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere with,
                        unannounced inspections of my Practice Location(s) and patient
                        records by a College representative for the purposes of monitoring
                        my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT 

            (8)   I, Dr. Wu, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to in
                  this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (9)   I, Dr. Wu, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely responsible
                  for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the
                  implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking.

            (10)  I, Dr. Wu, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions of
                  this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in
                  reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do
                  so.

            (11)  I, Dr. Wu, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking to
                  any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at any
                  Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff").

            (12)  I, Dr. Wu, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in any one or more of the following:
                  consideration by the QAC, an investigation by the College, or further
                  action by the College, including a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee.

            (13)  I, Dr. Wu, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (14)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Wu, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Wu, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking being
                        posted in accordance with section (14)(a) above, the following
                        summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the time
                        period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                              
                  
                  
                              Concerns have been identified with respect to Dr. Wu's
                              knowledge, skill and judgment. As a result:
                  
                                    *     Dr. Wu will practise under the guidance of a
                                          Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College
                                          effective immediately, and for the period up to
                                          and including December 31, 2017. 
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (15)  I, Dr. Wu, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make appropriate
                  enquiries of OHIP and/or any person who or institution that may have
                  relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my compliance
                  with the provisions of this Undertaking.

            (16)  I, Dr. Wu, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent form,
                  attached hereto as Appendix "B".

            (17)  I, Dr. Wu, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the
                  following information to all Clinical Supervisors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (18)  I, Dr. Wu, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all
                  Chief(s) of Staff with any information arising from the monitoring of my
                  compliance with this Undertaking.

            (19)  I, Dr. Wu, give my irrevocable consent to all Clinical Supervisors or
                  Chiefs of Staff, to disclose to the College, and to one another, any
                  information:

                  (a)   relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   relevant to the provisions of the Clinical Supervisor's undertaking
                        set out at Appendix "C";
                  
                  (c)   relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this
                        Undertaking; and 
                  
                  (d)   which comes to their attention in the course of providing the
                        Professional Education and which they reasonably believe indicates
                        a potential risk of harm to my patients.

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: September 27, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Sing Man Wu to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective September 27, 2017:

Concerns have been identified with respect to Dr. Wu’s knowledge, skill and judgment. As a result:

- Dr. Wu will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College effective immediately, and for the period up to and including December 31, 2017.