Wu, Vincent Man Yin (CPSO#: 65491)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Jun 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 305
1 Quarry Ridge
Barrie ON  L4M 7G1
Phone: (705) 728-5311
Fax: (705) 728-5601
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Vincent Wu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 12 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Wu ( CPSO# 65491 )

Business Address:
305 - 1 Quarry Ridge Road
Barrie ON  L4M 7G1
Phone Number: (705) 728-6821

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 25 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VINCENT MAN YIN WU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WU is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1993