Wulffhart, Jeffrey Ivor (CPSO#: 62895)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jul 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jul 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Afrikaans, English, Hebrew

Education:University of Witwatersrand, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
285 CUMMER AVENUE
Toronto ON  M2M 2G1
Phone: (416) 226-6780 Ext. 7111
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

14 St. Matthews Road
Toronto ON  M4M 2B5
Canada
Phone: (416) 461-8251
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Wulffhart Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 31 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Wulffhart ( CPSO# 62895 )

Business Address:
285 Cummer Avenue
Toronto ON  M2M 2G1
Phone Number: (416) 226-6780

Business Address:
1 Bridgepoint Drive
Toronto ON  M4M 2B5
Phone Number: (416) 461-8252

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bridgepoint Hospital Toronto
St John's Rehabilitation Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 2000 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JEFFREY IVOR WULFFHART may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WULFFHART is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 1990