Wunder, Jay Steven (CPSO#: 56899)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Jul 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Avenue
Suite 476
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-4800 Ext. 8807
Fax: (416) 586-8397
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Princess Margaret Hospital
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Canada
Phone: (416) 586-4800 Ext. 8807
Fax: (416) 586-8397
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jay Wunder Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 18 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Wunder ( CPSO# 56899 )

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
Suite 476
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 586-5995

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 15 Nov 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAY STEVEN WUNDER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WUNDER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 16 Jun 1986 to 15 Jun 1987
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Research Fellows - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 31 Dec 1993
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1987