Wyand, Anna Elizabeth Hastie (CPSO#: 77497)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Dalhousie University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Department of Anesthesiology
Box 249C
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 761-4169
Fax: (613) 761-5209
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Wyand Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 03 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Wyand ( CPSO# 77497 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital - Civic Campus
Department of Anesthesiology
1053 Carling Avenue
Suite 249C
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 761-4169

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANNA ELIZABETH HASTIE WYAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WYAND is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2007