Wyatt, Diana Silver (CPSO#: 56578)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Jan 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Feb 2011

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Bath Institution
5775 Bath Road
Bath ON  K0H 1G0
Phone: (613) 351-8014
Electoral District: 06
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Collins Bay Minimum Institution
1455 Bath Road
Kingston ON  K7L 5E6
Canada
Phone: (613) 536-6047
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D. Wyatt Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 12 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Wyatt ( CPSO# 56578 )

Business Address:
Bath Institution
5775 Bath Road
Bath ON  K0H 1G0
Phone Number: (613) 351-8014

Business Address:
Collins Bay Minimum
1455 Bath Road
Kingston ON  K7L 5E2
Phone Number: (613) 636-6047

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DIANA SILVER WYATT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WYATT is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jan 1986
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2000
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2000
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 05 Sep 2000
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 02 Jan 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 2011

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 03 Dec 1999
Summary:

On  December 3, 1999, the Discipline Committee accepted Dr. Wyatt's plea and found her guilty 
of professional misconduct in that she committed an act or omission relevant to the practice of 
medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members 
as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional and failure to maintain the records that are 
required to be kept respecting a member's patients and that she failed to make, retain or make 
available required patient records. 
 
At the penalty hearing of February 28 and 29, 2000, the Committee reserved its decision.  On 
June 26, 2000, the Discipline Committee ordered and directed that: 
 
1.    Dr. Wyatt be reprimanded and that the reprimand be recorded on the register. 
 
2.    The Registrar impose a permanent term, condition and limitation on Dr. Wyatt's 
      certificate of registration, prohibiting her from engaging in psychotherapy as defined in 
      Schedule "1" to this Order. 
 
3.    The Registrar suspend Dr. Wyatt's certificate of registration for a period of 24 months, to 
      commence on a date to be fixed by the Registrar. 
 
4.    Twenty (20) months of the suspension ordered shall be suspended, provided that the 
      following conditions are fulfilled: 
 
i.     that Dr. Wyatt attend, at her own cost, a program about appropriate boundaries that is 
      satisfactory to the Registrar, and that she provide proof to the Registrar of having 
      attended and completed such a program within 12 months of beginning her suspension. 
 
ii.   that Dr. Wyatt receive psychotherapy and counseling, at her own cost, if any, by a 
      psychotherapist satisfactory to the Registrar, for a minimum period of 24 months, or until 
      such time as the psychotherapist and the Registrar agree that such therapy is no longer 
      necessary. 
 
iii.  that the psychotherapist shall confirm the participation and cooperation of Dr. Wyatt in 
      the psychotherapeutic relationship by way of a written report to the Registrar every three 
      months throughout the duration of therapy commencing on the three month anniversary 
      date of this order. 
 
iv.   that for a period of 20 months from the date she returns to practice, Dr. Wyatt will 
      authorize the Ministry of Health to submit a summary of her monthly billings for the 
      Registrar to review. Should the Registrar observe any billing pattern that suggests that Dr. 
      Wyatt is engaging in psychotherapy as prohibited by this order, he is directed to arrange 
      for a peer review audit by a family physician selected by him. The auditor will examine 
      Dr. Wyatt's records and provide a written report to the Registrar on whether Dr. Wyatt is 
      engaging in psychotherapy and, if so, the nature of it. Dr. Wyatt understands and agrees 
      that the Registrar may take such action as is appropriate on the basis of these reports and 
      she will be responsible for any costs associated with these reviews. 
 
5.    In the event that Dr. Wyatt fails to fulfill any of the above conditions, then the balance of 
      her suspension will be served to commence on a date to be fixed by the Registrar. 
 
Schedule "1" 
 
      For the purpose of this Order, psychotherapy shall mean any form of treatment for the 
      maintenance of mental or emotional well being and any form of treatment for mental or 
      emotional illness, behavioural maladaptations, and/or other problems that are assumed to 
      be of a mental or emotional nature, in which a physician deliberately establishes a 
      professional relationship with a patient for the purposes of maintaining, removing, 
      modifying or retarding existing symptoms, or attenuating or reversing disturbed patterns 
      of behaviour and of promoting positive personality growth and development. This is not 
      intended to include occasional and incidental counselling that arises in the course of 
      normal medical practice. 
 
On February 1, 2011, the Discipline Committee, further to a motion by Dr. Wyatt, varied the 
Order of June 26, 2000 and directed the removal of the term, condition and limitation on Dr. 
Wyatt's certificate of registration prohibiting her from engaging in psychotherapy. 
 
 
 

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Nov 08, 1999