Wybenga, Milton Peter (CPSO#: 64359)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 16 Jun 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 16 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 05 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 1991
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Aug 2006
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 16 Jun 2008