Wyman, Jennifer Judith (CPSO#: 63643)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Jul 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 712
586 Eglinton Avenue East
Toronto ON  M4P 1P2
Phone: (416) 440-1880
Fax: (416) 440-1106
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Womens College Hospital
76 Grenville St
Toronto ON  M5S 2B6
Canada
Phone: 416-323-7559
Fax: 416-323-7739
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jennifer Wyman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 21 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Wyman ( CPSO# 63643 )

Business Address:
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5J 1B2

Business Address:
Suite 712
586 Eglinton Avenue East
Toronto ON  M4P 1P2
Phone Number: (416) 440-1880

Business Address:
32 Simcoe Street South
Oshawa ON  L1H 4G2
Phone Number: (905) 720-0506

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JENNIFER JUDITH WYMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WYMAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 31 Dec 1993
Resident 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 1992