Wyman, Roy Jeffrey (CPSO#: 68219)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jul 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 105
840 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 5T2
Phone: (416) 469-6464
Fax: (416) 469-6164
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Roy Wyman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 21 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Wyman ( CPSO# 68219 )

Business Address:
Suite 105
840 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 5T2
Phone Number: (416) 469-6464

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto
Providence Health Care,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1996 CFPC Specialist
FCFP - Family Medicine Effective: 29 Oct 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROY JEFFREY WYMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WYMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1996