Wynd, Kimberly Pauline (CPSO#: 89921)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Dec 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Dec 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
Department of Anaesthesia
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone: (705) 743-2121
Fax: (705) 876-5120
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kimberly P. Wynd Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 21 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Wynd ( CPSO# 89921 )

Business Address:
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
Department of Anaesthesia
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone Number: (705) 743-2121

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 28 May 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KIMBERLY PAULINE WYND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WYND is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Oct 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 14 Oct 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Dec 2009