Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Wynd, Peter Brian (CPSO#: 20704)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 21 Jun 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 21 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may write to the following address: Box 986 Peterborough, ON K9J 1A5
Date Received: 21 Jun 2010

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 01 Jan 1974 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1965
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 May 1967
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 21 Jun 2010