Wyndowe, Jeffrey Peter (CPSO#: 28095)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2016


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 77 Charles Street West Toronto ON M5S 0B2
Date Received: 24 May 2016


Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 13 Apr 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1969
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 1970
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Mar 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016