Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Wynne, Linda Ann (CPSO#: 61930)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Feb 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Feb 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Dept of Anesthesia
B309
1053 Carling Ave
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 761-4169
Fax: (613) 761-5209
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Department Anaesthesia
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Canada
Phone: (613) 761-4169
Fax: (613) 761-5209
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: L. Wynne Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 15 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Wynne ( CPSO# 61930 )

Business Address:
1550 - 501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8949

Business Address:
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9
Phone Number: (613) 798-5555

Business Address:
1145 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Z 7K4
Phone Number: (613) 722-6521

Business Address:
Ottawa Hospital - Civic Campus
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 761-4164

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 16 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LINDA ANN WYNNE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WYNNE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Feb 1990