Wyshynski, Peter Edward (CPSO#: 19020)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1961

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 50 Albert Street Waterloo, ON N2L 3S2
Date Received: 26 May 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 01 Jan 1968 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Aug 1962
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Apr 1964
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2014