Xenoyannis, George Leonidas (CPSO#: 80825)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
104 - 333 Athlone Avenue
Woodstock ON  N4V 0B8
Phone: (519) 290-2460
Fax: (519) 286-0472
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

310 Juliana Drive
Woodstock ON  N4V 0A4
Canada
Phone: (519) 421-4211
County: County of Oxford
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Green Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 23 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Xenoyannis ( CPSO# 80825 )
Dr. K. Green ( CPSO# 79629 )

Business Address:
Woodstock General Hospital
310 Juliana Drive
Woodstock ON  N4V 0A4
Phone Number: (519) 537-5951

Business Address:
104 - 333 Athlone Avenue
Woodstock ON  N4V 0B8
Phone Number: (519) 290-2460

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Woodstock General Hospital Woodstock

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GEORGE LEONIDAS XENOYANNIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. XENOYANNIS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009