Xeroulis, George James (CPSO#: 77574)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Greek

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 502
95 Bayly Street West
Ajax ON  L1S 7K8
Phone: (905) 427-1718
Fax: (905) 427-3827
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 920
305 Milner Avenue
Scarborough ON  M1B 3V4
Canada
Phone: (416) 321-3883
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

1031 Brock Rd.
Pickering ON  L1W 3T7
Canada
Phone: (905) 683-1700
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: George Xeroulis Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 24 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Xeroulis ( CPSO# 77574 )

Business Address:
502 - 95 Bayly Street West
Ajax ON  L1S 7K8
Phone Number: (905) 427-1718

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GEORGE JAMES XEROULIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. XEROULIS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2007