Xie, Jinchao (CPSO#: 103008)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Mandarin

Education:University of Ottawa, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
210 Melrose Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4K7
Phone: (613) 761-4334
Fax: (613) 761-4200
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

103--99 Kakulu Rd
Ottawa ON  K2L 3C8
Canada
Phone: 613-592-1448
Fax: 613-591-3778
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2016 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JINCHAO XIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. XIE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2016