Xu, Bin (CPSO#: 102042)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 May 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 May 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:McGill University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Hospital
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4M 3M5
Phone: 416-480-4011
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Bin Xu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 27 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Xu ( CPSO# 102042)

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Hospital
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 481-6100

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - New York

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BIN XU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. XU is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2013 to 15 Dec 2013
Elective Trainee - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Dec 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 May 2016