Xu, Fei James (CPSO#: 103939)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
QHC Belleville General Hospital
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8N 5A9
Phone: (613) 969-7400
Electoral District: 06

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Campbellford Memorial Hospital Campbellford
Quinte Health Care,Trenton Memorial Trenton
Quinte Healthcare,Belleville General Site Belleville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2016 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FEI JAMES XU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. XU is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2016