Xu, Kunyong (CPSO#: 97563)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

Queen's University, 01 Jan 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Oct 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

Queen's University, 01 Nov 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2017