Xu, Zhaodong (CPSO#: 89242)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Sep 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Sep 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Mandarin

Education:China Medical University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Department of Pathology and
Lab Medicine
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8899 Ext. 79260
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Hematological Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ZHAODONG XU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. XU is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 22 Sep 2008
Assessment Verification Period - Hematological Pathology

University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Hematological Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Hematological Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Hematological Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematological Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Sep 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Sep 2012