Xue, Shuwen (CPSO#: 79679)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Mar 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:Capital University of Medical Sciences, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
11 Victoria Avenue
Chatham ON  N7L 2Z7
Phone: (519) 397-0684
Fax: (519) 397-1817
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Xue Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 22 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Xue ( CPSO# 79679 )

Business Address:
11 Victoria Avenue
Chatham ON  N7L 2Z7
Phone Number: (519) 397-0684

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Chatham Public General Hospital Society Chatham
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 31 Jul 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHUWEN XUE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. XUE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 08 Aug 2003
PEAP - Resident - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 08 Aug 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 31 Jul 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Mar 2005