Xuereb, Dennis (CPSO#: 26266)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2009

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian, Maltese

Education:Royal University of Malta, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 08 Nov 1973 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1969 to 30 Jun 1970
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1970 to 30 Jun 1971
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1971 to 30 Jun 1972
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1972 to 30 Jun 1973
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1973 to 30 Jun 1974
PostGrad Yr 6 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Dec 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1994
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jan 2003
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2009

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 23 Nov 1995
Summary:

 In November 1995, Dr. Xuereb pleaded guilty to a charge of professional misconduct, as defined in 
 s. 29(22) of Ontario Regulation 548/90, as amended, in that he failed to maintain the standard of 
 practice of the profession.  The Discipline Committee accepted this plea, and found Dr. Xuereb 
 guilty of professional misconduct.  The Committee also accepted a joint submission as to penalty, 
 and consequently ordered that:

1.	Dr. Xuereb was to be reprimanded, with the fact of the 
 reprimand to be recorded on the Register.

2.	Dr. Xuereb not being presently licenced to practice 
 in Ontario, the Committee ordered that if he re-applied for a licence in Ontario, a restriction 
 would be imposed on his licence for an indefinite period such that he not be permitted to practice 
 gynaecological oncology.

3.	The imposition of the above restriction was to be suspended if Dr. 
 Xuereb took and completed a course in gynaecological oncology satisfactory to the Registrar.  The 
 imposition of the restriction was to remain suspended, provided that Dr. Xuereb submitted to an 
 audit of his gynaecological oncology cases thereafter for a period of two years by the Chief of 
 Staff of his hospital, and that the results of the audit were satisfactory to the Registrar.  On 
 fulfillment of these terms, the restriction on Dr. Xuereb(s licence, as set out in section 2 
 above, was to be removed.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Nov 23, 1995