Li, Yu (CPSO#: 95285)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jul 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Mandarin

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
200 - 785 Wonderland Rd. S
2nd Floor, Westmount Mall
London ON  N6K 1M6
Phone: 5196416712
Fax: 5196416189
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Yu Li Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 07 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Li ( CPSO# 95285 )

Business Address:
200 - 785 Wonderland Road South
2nd Floor, Westmount Mall
London ON  N6K 1M6
Phone Number: (519) 642-6712


Corporation Name: Dixon Fox Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 20 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Sargolzaei ( CPSO# 93341 )
Dr. Y. Li ( CPSO# 95285 )
Dr. B. Choudhary ( CPSO# 96892 )
Dr. J. Zhu ( CPSO# 96742 )
Dr. S. Cunningham-Dunlop ( CPSO# 103184)
Dr. D. Martyniak ( CPSO# 93596 )
Dr. B. Yemchuk ( CPSO# 51884 )
Dr. P. Fox ( CPSO# 57143 )
Dr. D. Dixon ( CPSO# 65384 )
Dr. G. Abdel Malek ( CPSO# 86844 )

Business Address:
West London Family Health Clinic
Unit 200
785 Wonderland Road South
London ON  N6K 1M6
Phone Number: (519) 641-6712

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Alexandra Hospital Ingersoll
Clinton Public Hospital Clinton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 Jul 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. YU LI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 2013