First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 14 Feb 2000 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 13 Feb 2002 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 14 Feb 2002 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Apr 2002 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 May 2002 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Oct 2002 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 21 Nov 2002 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 17 Aug 2006 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 17 Aug 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 24 Mar 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Mar 2008 |