Yabsley, Reginald Herbert (CPSO#: 19650)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1960

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 04 Dec 1965 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 1960
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 1965
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 23 Jan 1967
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 1993
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2002