Yach, Jeffrey David (CPSO#: 66809)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
Watkins 3-104
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 549-6666 Ext. 3961
Fax: (613) 548-1306
Electoral District: 06
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Kingston Orthopaedic And
Pain Institute
Suite 500
797 Princess Street
Kingston ON  K7L 1G1
Canada
Phone: (613) 507-7246
Fax: (613) 344-1203
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jeffrey Yach Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 29 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Yach ( CPSO# 66809 )

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Nickle 3-305
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 549-6666

Business Address:
500 - 797 Princess Street
Kingston ON  K7L 1G1
Phone Number: (613) 344-1202


Corporation Name: Borschneck Yach Bardana Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 28 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Borschneck ( CPSO# 64068 )
Dr. D. Bardana ( CPSO# 68252 )
Dr. J. Yach ( CPSO# 66809 )

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
Victory 3
Room 3-3-119
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 549-6666

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JEFFREY DAVID YACH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YACH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1999 to 31 Jul 1999
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1998