Yacoob, Marlene Nadia (CPSO#: 64048)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Aug 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Irvine Odyssey Medical Center
Suite 115
22 Odyssey
Irvine CA  92618
United States
Phone: (949) 988-7550
Fax: (949) 988-7551

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1993 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARLENE NADIA YACOOB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YACOOB is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 1992