Yacoub, Amgad Kamal Ibrahim (CPSO#: 72905)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Aug 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Aug 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Ain Shams University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Rouge Valley Ajax and Pickering
580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax ON  L1S 2J4
Phone: (905) 683-2320
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Amgad Yacoub Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 08 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Yacoub ( CPSO# 72905 )

Business Address:
580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax ON  L1S 2J4
Phone Number: (905) 683-2320

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 17 May 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AMGAD KAMAL IBRAHIM YACOUB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YACOUB is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 2004