Yacyshyn, Bruce Rudolf (CPSO#: 53113)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 05 Jul 1989

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 05 Jul 1989

Summary

Former Name: Yacyshyn, Bruce Rodolf (used until: 14 Jan 1985 )

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Alberta, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 06 Jun 1988 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 22 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 Jul 1989