Yadav, Geeta (CPSO#: 93286)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Sep 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Hindi

Education:Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Women's College Hospital
76 Grenville St., 5th Floor
RKS Dermatology Centre
Toronto ON  M5S 1B1
Phone: 416-323-7546
Fax: 416-323-6236
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 30 Sep 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GEETA YADAV may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YADAV is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 02 Oct 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 03 Oct 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Sep 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 2015