Yadav, Mahesh Prasad (CPSO#: 24861)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Jul 1972

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jul 1972

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Marathi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Nagpur University, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1221 Algonquin Avenue
Suite 504
North Bay ON  P1B 4Y3
Phone: (705) 472-0520
Fax: (705) 494-8831
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Yadav Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 09 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Yadav ( CPSO# 24861 )

Business Address:
504 - 1221 Algonquin Avenue
North Bay ON  P1B 4Y3
Phone Number: (705) 472-0520

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 16 Nov 1971 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MAHESH PRASAD YADAV may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YADAV is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 1967
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1970
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 1972