Yadegari, Andrew Barbod (CPSO#: 87647)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi, French

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 412
1371 Neilson Road
Scarborough ON  M1B 4Z8
Phone: (416) 281-9499
Fax: (416) 283-5705
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

2nd Floor
235 Salem Road
Ajax ON  L1Z 0B1
Canada
Phone: (905) 426-8333
Fax: (905) 426-4447
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Andrew B. Yadegari Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 29 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Yadegari ( CPSO# 87647 )

Business Address:
Suite 412
1371 Neilson Road
Scarborough ON  M1B 4Z8
Phone Number: (416) 281-9499

Business Address:
2nd Floor
235 Salem Road
Ajax ON  L1Z 0B1
Phone Number: (905) 426-8333

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 03 Oct 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREW BARBOD YADEGARI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YADEGARI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 04 Sep 2007 to 28 Sep 2007
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 10 Aug 2009 to 28 Aug 2009
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Sep 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Aug 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011