Yaffe, Mark John (CPSO#: 43937)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Sep 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Sep 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3830 Lacombe Avenue
Montreal QC  H3T 1M5
Phone: (514) 734-2677
Fax: (514) 734-2602

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1978 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARK JOHN YAFFE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YAFFE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1979
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Sep 1989