Yahya, Ayel Omar Q (CPSO#: 111353)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Jan 2017

Expiry Date:  10 Apr 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 04 Apr 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Khalid University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Division of Hematology
Box 201A
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8899
Electoral District: 07

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nova Scotia
Saudi Arabia

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AYEL OMAR Q YAHYA shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. YAHYA is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF OTTAWA;

(2) Dr. YAHYA shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. YAHYA is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. YAHYA shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. YAHYA is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. YAHYA no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 10 Apr 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 10 Jan 2017 to 03 Apr 2017
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Ottawa, 04 Apr 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 10 Jan 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Apr 2017
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 10 Apr 2018