Yakemchuk, Valerie Norah (CPSO#: 51977)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jan 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Feb 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton Health Sciences
Department Of Nuclear Medicine
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone: (905) 527-4322 Ext. 75667
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

St Josephs Hospital
50 Charleton Ave East
Department of Nuclear Medicine
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Canada
Phone: 9055221155
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 25 Nov 1986 RCPSC Specialist
Nuclear Medicine Effective: 01 Dec 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VALERIE NORAH YAKEMCHUK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YAKEMCHUK is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1981
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Feb 1987