Yakimov, Margaret Catherine (CPSO#: 60498)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 22 Oct 1990

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 31 May 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1989 to 30 Jun 1989
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jan 1989
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 22 Oct 1990