Yaltho, Cheerakathottom Mathew (CPSO#: 45358)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 08 Jun 2001

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 08 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Malayalam

Education:University of Kerala, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 10 Jun 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Sep 1976
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1979
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Dec 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 08 Jun 2001