Yam, Edric Che Wai (CPSO#: 66513)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Jul 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Pinnacle Health Sciences Centre
9651 Yonge Street #2
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 1V7
Phone: (905) 780-8823
Fax: (905) 780-8821
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Edric Che Wai Yam Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 06 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Yam ( CPSO# 66513 )

Business Address:
Pinnacle Health Sciences Centre
Suite 2
9651 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 1V7
Phone Number: (905) 780-8823

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1995 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EDRIC CHE WAI YAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YAM is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 1995