Yam, Kwan Ming (CPSO#: 111288)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 05 Feb 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 05 Feb 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Chinese University of Hong Kong, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 21 Dec 2016 to 03 Jan 2017
PEAP - Resident - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 04 Jan 2017 to 05 Feb 2017
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 21 Dec 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 Jan 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jan 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 Feb 2017