Yamada, Koki (CPSO#: 101986)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Aug 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Aug 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:JICHI Ikadaigaku, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2013 to 23 Nov 2013
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 24 Nov 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Aug 2014
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Nov 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Nov 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2014