Yamada, Yoshiya (CPSO#: 67724)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 31 Aug 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Aug 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Alberta, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 May 1999
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Aug 2000