Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Yamamura, Deborah Lynn Reiko (CPSO#: 65636)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jul 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton General Hospital Site
Hamilton Health Sciences
Microbiology Department
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 527-4322 Ext. 46111
Fax: (905) 577-8027
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John K. Marshall Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 05 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Marshall ( CPSO# 65428 )
Dr. D. Yamamura ( CPSO# 65636 )

Business Address:
1280 Main Street West
Suite 2F59
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 10 Sep 1998 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Microbiology Effective: 30 Sep 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DEBORAH LYNN REIKO YAMAMURA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YAMAMURA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 5 - Infectious Diseases

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 6 - Medical Microbiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Sep 1998
Resident 6 - Medical Microbiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 1993