Yamka, Edward Michael (CPSO#: 19512)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 16 Nov 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 16 Nov 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 01 Jan 1971 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1964
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1965
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Nov 2012
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 16 Nov 2012