Yan, David Benedict (CPSO#: 65532)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Avenue
Room 410
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-5151
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Ground Floor #3
700 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1Z5
Canada
Phone: (416) 586-9626
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

1880 Sismet Road
Mississauga ON  L4W 1W9
Canada
Phone: (905) 212-9482
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DB Yan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 06 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Yan ( CPSO# 65532 )

Business Address:
Suite 310
790 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1N8
Phone Number: (416) 926-1504

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
700 University Avenue
Room 410
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 586-4800

Business Address:
1880 Sismet Road
Mississauga ON  L4W 1W9
Phone Number: (905) 212-9482

Business Address:
700 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1Z5
Phone Number: (416) 977-8194

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kensington Eye Institute Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID BENEDICT YAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Resident 4 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1993