Yan, Raymond Tze-Heng (CPSO#: 76397)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 412
1371 Neilson Road
Toronto ON  M1B 4Z8
Phone: (416) 281-9499
Fax: (416) 283-5705
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

2nd Floor
235 Salem Road
Ajax ON  L1Z 0B1
Canada
Phone: (905) 426-8333
Fax: (905) 426-4447
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Raymond T. Yan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 15 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Yan ( CPSO# 76397 )

Business Address:
Suite 412
1371 Neilson Road
Toronto ON  M1B 4Z8
Phone Number: (416) 281-9499

Business Address:
E5- 235 Salem Road
Ajax ON  L1Z 0B1
Phone Number: (905) 426-8333

Business Address:
Scarborough and Rouge Hospital
2867 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 4B9
Phone Number: (416) 284-8131

Business Address:
Lakeridge Health Ajax Pickering Hospital
580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax ON  L1S 2J4
Phone Number: (905) 683-2320

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 21 Sep 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAYMOND TZE-HENG YAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2005