Yanchar, Natalie Lynn (CPSO#: 68579)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 1998

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Queen's University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 04 Nov 1996 RCPSC Specialist
Pediatric General Surgery Effective: 19 Nov 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 07 Nov 1994 to 21 Dec 1994
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 1997 to 31 Dec 1997
Resident 6 - Paediatric Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 1998 to 31 Dec 1998
Resident 7 - Paediatric Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Nov 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Dec 1994
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Jan 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1998