Yang, Changgao (CPSO#: 65737)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 22 Aug 1997

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 22 Aug 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Shandong, Binzhou Medical College, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Pathology Effective: 03 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - General Pathology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - General Pathology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - General Pathology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - General Pathology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - General Pathology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 22 Aug 1997
Resident 4 - General Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Aug 1997