Yang, Hongji (CPSO#: 78804)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 10 Aug 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 10 Aug 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Harbin Medical University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 21 Jan 2003 to 31 Mar 2003
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Transplantation

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Apr 2003 to 20 Jan 2004
Clinical Fellow - Transplantation

The University of Western Ontario, 21 Jan 2004 to 20 Jan 2005
Clinical Fellow - Transplantation

The University of Western Ontario, 21 Jan 2005 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Transplantation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 21 Jan 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 19 May 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2019
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 10 Aug 2017