Yang, Iwan (CPSO#: 66538)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
MCI Medical Clinic
245 Eglinton Avenue East
Toronto ON  M4P 3B7
Phone: (416) 488-1455
Fax: (416) 488-8846
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: H. Leong-Poi and I. Yang Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 17 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Yang ( CPSO# 66538 )
Dr. H. Leong-Poi ( CPSO# 65521 )

Business Address:
245 Eglinton Avenue East
Toronto ON  M4P 3B7
Phone Number: (416) 488-1455

Business Address:
30 Bond Street
Suite 6-044
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-5845

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1995 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. IWAN YANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YANG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1995